This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/05/2017 at 12:04:07 (UTC).

ANISE WARREN VS CEBREN B. HINES

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 ANISE WARREN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CEBREN B HINES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1555

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANISE WARREN

Antioch, CA 94531

Respondent

CEBREN BUIE HINES

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • F/L APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE FROM CEBREN BUIE HINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR FIRST PAPER FEE FROM ANISE WARREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FEE COLLECTED FOR SALE OF SMALL PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • CHECK FOR FIRST APP. FEE FOR PTR $435.00; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • CHECK FOR FIRST PAPER FEE OR REVISED FW FROM RESPONDENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/25/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/29/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/25/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/29/2017 OF ANISE WARREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ANISE WARREN (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less