This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 11:53:44 (UTC).

AMAYA VS MOORE,S.T.P.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 AMAYA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOORE,S T P. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1375

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCIO AMAYA

Defendant

PATRICK MOORE, S.T.P WAREHOUSE, LLC, A LIMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, ROBERT A.

540 Lennon Lane

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/11/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/25/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2019 OF LUCIO AMAYA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, ROBERT A