This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 21:22:30 (UTC).

ALLEN VS PULTE

Case Summary

On 11/16/2012 ALLEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2719

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DARRYL C ALLEN

BIBIANA M BEASTON

ORRA THEADORE

JAMES BERSTORM

MICKEY PEDRONI

MICHELLE BROWN

KATHLEEN PEDRONI

CHRIS BROWN

WALTHERA M VANDEN BROEK

AMY PAULSON

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

CONCORD PLU MBING COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Defendants

MOES 1-100

BILL WILDER CONSTRUCTION CO

CONCORD PLU MBING COMPANY

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC.

ACE LATHING, INC.

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC.

SAN MARINO PLASTERING, INC.

BRENTWOOD SHEETMETAL HEATING & AIR

FLOOR SPACE, INC.

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

1650 Hotel Circle N Orth Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

NUNEZ, ELIZABETH A

1655 Grant Street, Ste.800-B Law Offices Of Timothy Wagner

Concord, CA 94520

, DAVID J. DEM ORDANT

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

SNYDER, MARTIN T.

399 Taylor Blvd. Suite 206

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

LOCKHART, ROBERT D.

1230 Oakmead Pkwy, Suite 306

Sunnyvale, CA 94085-4017

ONETO, JULIE V

101 Second Street Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

HARRELSON, THOMAS M

533 Airport Blvd Suite 300

Burlingame, CA 94010

MAYFIELD, LORI R

1435 River Park Dr Suite 504

Sacramento, CA 95815

DEMORDAUNT, DAVID J.

215 Lennon Lane Ste 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

KENNICK, MICHAEL T.

110 E. Wilshire Avenue Ste. 401

Fullerton, CA 92832

STARSKY, JEFFREY M

4700 Lang Ave

Mcclellan, CA 95652

DEMORDAUNT, DAVID J

401 Lennon Lane Suite 125

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

BLACKWELL, PATRICIA A

1655 Grant Street Suite 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PHAN-QUANG, TRUMAN

71 Stevenson St. Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

EUBANK, BRET W

27710 Jefferson Avenue Suite 102

Temecula, CA 92590

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive, Ste 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HAMRICK III, A RAYMOND

2600 W. Olive Avenue Suite 1020

Burbank, CA 91505

CROWLEY, DANIEL F

3558 Round Barn Blvd Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

GUALCO, LORI J

455 Capitol Mall, Suite 210

Sacramento, CA 95814

5 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 9/15/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT OF T & C ROOFING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
541 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/16/2012 OF DARRYL ALLEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/16/2012 OF DARRYL ALLEN PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/15/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/31/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • JAMES BERSTORM, BONNI BERGSTORM, DONALD P BILODEAU, CATHRINE BILODEAU, DONALD AND CATHRINEBILODEAU ASTRUSTEES OF, CARL PIERRE BRANTOME, THERESE GISELE BRANTOME, CHRIS BROWN, MICHELLE BROWN, FRANCES R DE WIT ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • RAKESH K BHARGAV, MARK E BEASTON, BIBIANA MBEASTON ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BILL WILDER CONSTRUCTION CO is a litigant

Latest cases where CONCORD PLU MBING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FLOOR SPACE, INC is a litigant