Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 19:05:00 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA WILSON VS UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE

Case Summary

On 04/11/2013 ALEXANDRIA WILSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0680

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRIA WILSON

Defendant

UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE ALLIANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNUM, RANDAL M.

279 East H. Street

Benicia, CA 94510

Defendant Attorney

BRUNO, MICHAEL D.

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL ON UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 12/15/14 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • CHECK FOR NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY ALEXANDRIA WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2013
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2013 OF ALEXANDRIA WILSON RE: BUSINESS UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE ALLIANCE W/MAILING ON 04/30/13 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2013 OF ALEXANDRIA WILSON FILED BY UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE ALLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/24/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/17/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2013 OF ALEXANDRIA WILSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruno, Michael D.