This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/14/2021 at 13:55:40 (UTC).

ACCESS AUTO VS VARASENA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2015 ACCESS AUTO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VARASENA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0319

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FAILURE TO PROSECUTE BY ATTY JOHNSON; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 6/24/15 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/05/2015 OF ACCESS AUTO CENTER,INC. FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/24/15 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/13/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less