This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 08:31:54 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL VS BABOT

Case Summary

On 08/04/2016 A-L FINANCIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BABOT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0388

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Po Box 11907

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Defendant

LEANNE M BABOT

Vallejo, CA 94591-7524

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION ON LEANNE M BABOT; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION FOR LEANNE M BABOT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • MEMO OF COSTS ACCRUED MAILED ON 11/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN AMOUNT OF $147.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN AMOUNT OF $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION WAS SET FOR 12/20/17 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION ON LEANNE M BABOT; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION FOR LEANNE M BABOT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 10/05/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED ON BEHALF OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/04/2016 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP. AS TO LEANNE M BABOT FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/02/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $1,148.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/03/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.