This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 07:52:29 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP VS SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 05/21/2015 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0268

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP

P.O. Box 11907

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Defendant

MILTHON SANDOVAL

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketHEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION ON MILTHON SANDOVAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF BENCH WARRANT LETTER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketBENCH WARRANT WARNING LETTER ISSUED FOR MILTHON SANDOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketHEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION ON MILTHON SANDOVAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketHEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION WAS SET FOR 1/11/19 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION FOR MILTHON SANDOVAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketHEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION ON MILTHON SANDOVAL; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketHEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION WAS SET FOR 12/07/18 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED A-L FINANCIAL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketBENCH WARRANT RETURNED NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 07/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/21/2015 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP AS TO MILTHON SANDOVAL FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/02/15. FEE FOR SERVICE $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/17/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketCLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketAMOUNT OF CLAIM $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant