This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 08:33:12 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP. VS MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0429

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

P.O. Box 11907

Santa Ana, CA 92711-1907

Defendant

KAYLEASE D MARQUEZ

San Pablo, CA 94806-2720

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,204.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • MEMO OF COSTS ACCRUED MAILED ON 12/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN AMOUNT OF $20.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 10/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 10/24/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED ON BEHALF OF PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/25/2016 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP. AS TO KAYLEASE D MARQUEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/24/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/21/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $1,034.36

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.