This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 00:23:05 (UTC).

580 GARCIA PROPERTIES VS. BIOZONE

Case Summary

On 04/15/2014 580 GARCIA PROPERTIES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIOZONE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0754

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

580 GARCIA PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CO

BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A NEVADA CORPOR

BIOZONE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,A NEVADA COR

MUSCLEPHARM CORPORATION

BIOZONE ACQUISITIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORP

COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR

ELLIOT M MAZA

OPKO HEALTH, INC.

COCRYSTAL PHARMA, INC.

BRIAN KELLER

PHILLIP FROST

ROBERTO PREGO-NOVO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOFFMAN, JASON L

3455 American River Dr, Ste C

Sacramento, CA 95824

CELLA, CHRISTOPHER L

1600 Main Street Suite 180

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LANGE, ROBERT J

1600 Main Street Suite 180

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

TAUCHES, JASON E

445 Orchard Street Suite 306

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

SHERMAN, MICHAEL A

15260 Ventura Blvd 20Th Fl

Sharman Oaks, CA 91403

SIEVERS, PAUL J.

19100 Von Karman Avenue Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • JURY TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 5 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CO, BIOZONE ACQUISITIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORP, COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR, COCRYSTAL PHARMA, INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CO, BIOZONE ACQUISITIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORP, COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR, COCRYSTAL PHARMA, INC.; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: WELLS FARGO ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • WELLS FARGO ORDER FILED BY BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CO, BIOZONE ACQUISITIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORP, COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR, COCRYSTAL PHARMA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED BY BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CO, BIOZONE ACQUISITIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORP, COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR, COCRYSTAL PHARMA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SU MMARY ADJUDICATION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • REQUEST OF BIOZONE LABORATORIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CO, BIOZONE ACQUISITIONS, INC., A DELAWARE CORP, COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR, COCRYSTAL PHARMA, INC. FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2014
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 6/24/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF 580 GARCIA PROPERTIES, LLC AS TO COCRYSTAL DISCOVERY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPOR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/01/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF 580 GARCIA PROPERTIES, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/02/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/20/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.