This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 02:46:40 (UTC).

466 CRECENT VS ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 466 CRECENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1078

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC

Defendants

DUSHUAN ALEXANDER

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUTT, DANIEL

111 Park Place, Ste 204

Richmond, CA 94801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 01/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2016 OF 466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT DUSHUAN ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2016 OF 466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT DUSHUAN ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2016 OF 466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2016 OF 466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 12/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT DUSHUAN ALEXANDER FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2016 OF 466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 1/28/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/14/2016 OF 466 CRESCENTINVESTORS LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less