This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 06:02:13 (UTC).

Wise, Heidi vs. Red Lantern, Inc

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Wise, Heidi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Red Lantern, Inc. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1621

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wise, Heidi

Defendants

City of Chico

Red Lantern, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson, Bruce Alan

Defendant Attorneys

Medellin, Sharon Ponce de Leon

Colvin, Roger A

Marchan, Laura N

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

06/25/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

06/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

06/28/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Red Lantern

07/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Red Lantern

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

07/26/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Dismissal - Counts 2/3 as to Red Lantern

08/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Counts 2/3 as to Red Lantern

Request for Dismissal-Entered in Part as to Second Cause of Action, Count 2, as to City of Chico

08/13/2021: Request for Dismissal-Entered in Part as to Second Cause of Action, Count 2, as to City of Chico

Answer - No Fee

08/18/2021: Answer - No Fee

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

08/18/2021: Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Summons

08/18/2021: Summons

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

09/15/2021: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to City of Chico

09/17/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to City of Chico

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Cross Complaint - Entered

09/22/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Cross Complaint - Entered

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Summons Issued and Filed; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Red Lantern; Answer - No Fee; Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Cross Complaint - Entered; Comment: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Cross Complaint - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to City of Chico; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to City of Chico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Comment: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint - No Fee; Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Comment: Defendant City of Chico's Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - No Fee; Comment: Defendant City of Chico's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: Premises Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: General Negligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal-Entered in Part as to Second Cause of Action, Count 2, as to City of Chico; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Second Cause of Action, Count 2 - Willful Failure to Warn, as to Defendant City of Chico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Counts 2/3 as to Red Lantern; Comment: Dismissal of Count 2 and 3 as to Red Lantern, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/15/2021; Served: 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Red Lantern; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Red Lantern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Chico is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDELLIN SHARON PONCE DE LEON ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLVIN ROGER ALLEN