This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/24/2023 at 18:28:27 (UTC).

Wilkie, Emily vs Stone, Kyle Mason et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Wilkie, Emily filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Stone, Kyle Mason. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0163

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilkie, Emily

Defendants

Stone, Kyle Mason

Hecker, Monty D

California Security Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorrells, Adam David

Defendant Attorneys

Hirsig, Peter Jon

Sullivan, Matthew Paul

 

Court Documents

Civil Minutes

01/04/2023: Civil Minutes

Defendants' Case Management Statement

12/13/2022: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

12/08/2022: Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

07/20/2022: Civil Minutes

Answer to Complaint

07/05/2022: Answer to Complaint

Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

06/28/2022: Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

Defendants' Case Management Statement

06/27/2022: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Proof / Affidavit of Publication

04/29/2022: Proof / Affidavit of Publication

Proof of Mailing

04/07/2022: Proof of Mailing

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

04/14/2023: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner

02/28/2023: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner

Proof of Mailing

02/15/2023: Proof of Mailing

Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Requests for Admissions

02/15/2023: Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Requests for Admissions

Civil Minutes

02/15/2023: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Verifications

02/02/2023: Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Verifications

Declaration of Matthew Sullivan in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Verifications

02/01/2023: Declaration of Matthew Sullivan in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Verifications

Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Verifications from Defendant Kyle Mason Stone

02/01/2023: Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Verifications from Defendant Kyle Mason Stone

Declaration of Adam Sorrells in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

01/13/2023: Declaration of Adam Sorrells in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 4 Day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 4 Day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to David Garner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Requests for Admissions, Set One, Form Interrogatories, Set One and Two, Request for Production of Documents, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. Defendant Kyle Mason Stone shall provide further verified responses within ten days of service of this order. Sanctions are awarded in favor of Plaintiffs and against Kyle Mason Stone in the amount of $2,000. The Court will sign the Proposed Order with the noted modifications.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Requests for Admissions; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Comment: Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Requests for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Request for Admissions; Declaration of Adam Sorrells in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Verifications from Defendant Kyle Mason Stone; Declaration of Matthew Sullivan in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery Verifications; Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Verifications; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Verifications to Request for Admissions; Plaintiff; Attorney: Sorrells, Adam David; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Sullivan, Matthew Paul; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Sullivan, Matthew Paul; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Sullivan, Matthew Paul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Negligent Infliction of Emotional Distress-Bystander-CACI 1621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Negligence of a Driver and Related Actions Against All Defendants; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 01/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 01/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less