Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 12:21:02 (UTC).

Walliser, Elizabeth vs. Grocery Outlet, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Walliser, Elizabeth filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Grocery Outlet, Inc. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glusman, Robert A and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1873

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glusman, Robert A

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walliser, Elizabeth

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Safeway, Inc

Grocery Outlet, Inc

Cross Defendant

Roes 1 Through 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kane, Bonnie Ellen

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Sager, Kristina Lynn

Jacobsen, Karen Lee

Buttrell, Laura Kathleen

Lynch, Jennifer Marie

Bruno, Michael David

Sugarman, Adam Benner

 

Court Documents

Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge

01/05/2021: Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

11/30/2020: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Defendant Grocery Outlet, Inc Answer to Complaint

10/23/2020: Defendant Grocery Outlet, Inc Answer to Complaint

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

10/21/2020: Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Answer of Defendant Safeway Inc

10/21/2020: Answer of Defendant Safeway Inc

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

09/22/2020: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons Issued and Filed

09/22/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Cover Sheet

09/22/2020: Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

09/22/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Summons Issued and Filed; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Answer of Defendant Safeway Inc; Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee); Defendant Grocery Outlet, Inc Answer to Complaint; Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment; Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Defendant Grocery Outlet, Inc Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint - No Fee; Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer of Defendant Safeway Inc; Comment: Answer of Defendant Safeway Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: Premises Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: General Negligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROCERY OUTLET is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant