This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 06:00:30 (UTC).

United Rentals (North America), Inc. vs Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 United Rentals North America , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stapleton-Spence Packing Co , a corporation. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Rentals (North America), Inc.

Defendants

Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a corporation

Cano, Dolores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wang, Jerry

Gaba, Rodolfo, Jr.

Guerrini, John D

 

Court Documents

Amended Abstract of Judgment - Issued

10/05/2022: Amended Abstract of Judgment - Issued

Proof of Service

09/29/2022: Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment

09/29/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

09/29/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

Default Judgment by Court

08/11/2022: Default Judgment by Court

Proof of Service by Mail

08/02/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Default Judgment

08/02/2022: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. in Support of Court Judgment

08/02/2022: Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. in Support of Court Judgment

Request to Enter Default-Entered

08/02/2022: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Notice of Case Management Conference

07/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

07/21/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

06/06/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

01/05/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a Corporation

10/20/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a Corporation

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

08/10/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons

08/10/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/10/2021: Complaint

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued; Amended Abstract of Judgment - Issued; Comment: Amended Abstract of Judgment - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling; Notice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Notice of Case Management Conference; Request to Enter Default-Entered; Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr. in Support of Court Judgment; Declaration in Lieu of Testimony in Support of Default Judgment; Proof of Service by Mail; Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; United Rentals (North America), Inc.; Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a corporation; Cano, Dolores; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; United Rentals (North America), Inc.; Awarded Against; Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a corporation; Cano, Dolores; Amount; Damages: $30,127.50; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $3,855.60; Attorney Fees: $2,662.75; Costs: $653.00; Total: $37298.85; Comment: Credit of $11,500- Making Judgement $25,798.85

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Lieu of Testimony CCP585; Comment: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony CCP585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a Corporation; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Stapleton-Spence Packing Co., a Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Contract; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $30127.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 08/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 10/05/2021; Served: 05/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less