This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 13:00:32 (UTC).

Thomas, Rayann vs Yu, Zhanhui

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Thomas, Rayann filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Yu, Zhanhui. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Keithley, Clare and Chandler, Christopher R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0569

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

Judge Details

Judges

Keithley, Clare

Chandler, Christopher R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Thomas, Rayann

Respondent

YU, Zhanhui

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Peterson, Jody M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketApplication for Publication or Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder for Publication or Posting; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketPetition for Disso, Legal Sep, Nullity, Dom Part

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterson, Jody M