This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 11:02:44 (UTC).

Taylor, Matthew John vs Valdez, Brandy Lee

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Taylor, Matthew John filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Valdez, Brandy Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1054

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Taylor, Matthew John

Respondent

Valdez, Brandy Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 7/21/2022 Temporary Orders Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Temporary Orders Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order- No Minor Children (NF); Comment: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order- no Minor Children (New File)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less