This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 19:04:07 (UTC).

Smith, Shane vs Blakley, Connor et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Smith, Shane filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blakley, Connor. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2823

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Shane

Defendants

Blakley, Connor

Bru Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Power, Stacie Lynn

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

11/10/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

11/10/2022: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

06/14/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

Writ of Possession

04/22/2022: Writ of Possession

Default Judgment by Clerk

04/22/2022: Default Judgment by Clerk

Third Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Bru Brands, Inc

04/06/2022: Third Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Bru Brands, Inc

Second Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley

04/06/2022: Second Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley

Request to Enter Default-Entered

04/06/2022: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Amended Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Connor Blakley

01/06/2022: Amended Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Connor Blakley

Amended Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Bru Brands, Inc

01/06/2022: Amended Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Bru Brands, Inc

Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley and Bru Brands

11/29/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley and Bru Brands

Proof of Mailing

11/16/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/16/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

11/16/2021: Summons

Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley and Bru Brands; Amended Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Bru Brands, Inc; Amended Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Connor Blakley; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Smith, Shane; Blakley, Connor; Bru Brands, Inc.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Smith, Shane; Awarded Against; Blakley, Connor; Bru Brands, Inc.; Amount; Damages: $25,000.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,062.50; Costs: $135.00; Total: $27197.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Third Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Bru Brands, Inc; Comment: Third Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Bru Brands, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Second Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley; Comment: Second Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Connor Blakley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Intentional Tort; Type: Action; Description: Fraud

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Contract; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 11/22/2021; Served: 11/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Power, Stacie Lynn