This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 10:57:27 (UTC).

Sladariu, Corneliu vs Sladariu, Daniel

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Sladariu, Corneliu filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sladariu, Daniel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1624

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Sladariu, Cornelio

Sladariu, Corneliu

Respondent

SLADARIU, DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Proof of Mailing; Order Dismissing Action; Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Proof of Mailing; Order Dismissing Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Respondent's Request for Order to Change Domestic Violence Order filed 12/02/2021 - Temporary Orders Denied; Order Shortening Time Granted; Respondent: Sladariu, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order; Filed 11/24/2021 - Temporary Orders Partly Granted; Respondent: Sladariu, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Order; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRFO-OSC-MTN - DV (No Fee); Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Request for Order to Change Domestic Violence Order - Order Shortening Time Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketResponse to Request for Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of DV-109 and DV-100 as to Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Temporary Orders Partly Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF); Comment: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order- no Minor Children (New File)

    Read MoreRead Less