This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 06:02:16 (UTC).

Sims, Lori vs. Singh, Jobanjit et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Sims, Lori filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Singh, Jobanjit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1524

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sims, Lori

Defendants

Singh, Jobanjit

State of California, Department of Transportation

County of Butte

Shaheen Transport LLC

YRJ Trucking Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Storment, Brandon Ryan

Lewis, Estee

Barr, Cathleen T.

Mudford, Troy Douglas

Defendant Attorney

Keowen, James Christopher

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/14/2021: Complaint

Summons

06/14/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

12/01/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

12/01/2021: Proof of Mailing

Errata to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

06/15/2021: Errata to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

Declaration as to Heir at Law and Successor in Interest

06/21/2021: Declaration as to Heir at Law and Successor in Interest

Order Re: First Amendment to Substitute True Name for Fictitious Name

06/24/2021: Order Re: First Amendment to Substitute True Name for Fictitious Name

Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California, Department of Transportation

07/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California, Department of Transportation

Proof of Service of Summons as to County of Butte

07/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to County of Butte

Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California, Department of Transportation

07/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California, Department of Transportation

Proof of Service of Summons as to County of Butte

07/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to County of Butte

Proof of Service of Summons as to Shaheen Transport LLC

07/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Shaheen Transport LLC

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jobanjit Singh

07/13/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Jobanjit Singh

State of California, Department of Transportation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

07/15/2021: State of California, Department of Transportation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Proof of Mailing Order Re First Amendment to Substitute True Name for Fictitious Name

08/02/2021: Proof of Mailing Order Re First Amendment to Substitute True Name for Fictitious Name

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to YRJ Trucking

09/01/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to YRJ Trucking

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Errata to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages; Declaration as to Heir at Law and Successor in Interest; Proof of Service of Summons as to Jobanjit Singh; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to YRJ Trucking; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to YRJ Trucking

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing Order Re First Amendment to Substitute True Name for Fictitious Name; Comment: Order Re First Amendment to Substitute True Name for Fictitious Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; State of California, Department of Transportation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Comment: State of California, Department of Transportation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Jobanjit Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Shaheen Transport LLC; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Shaheen Transport LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to County of Butte; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to County of Butte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to State of California, Department of Transportation; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint to State of California, Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to County of Butte; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Served: 06/24/2021; Served: 06/28/2021; Served: 06/28/2021; Served: 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/06/2021; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shaheen Transport, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNIA-DEPARTMENT OF PARKS is a litigant

Latest cases where County of Butte is a litigant