This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 04:19:42 (UTC).

Secretary of Veterans Affairs, an Officer of the United States of America vs Tarbush, Tarra

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Secretary of Veterans Affairs, an Officer of the United States of America filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tarbush, Tarra. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2725

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Secretary of Veterans Affairs, an Officer of the United States of America

Defendant

Tarbush, Tarra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zeff, Michael David

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

01/06/2022: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

Writ of Possession

12/21/2021: Writ of Possession

Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

12/20/2021: Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

12/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

12/17/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Tarra Tarbush

12/17/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Tarra Tarbush

Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Tarra Tarbush and Occupants

12/17/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Tarra Tarbush and Occupants

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Charles A. Higgs III

12/17/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Charles A. Higgs III

Returned Mail

11/16/2021: Returned Mail

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

01/06/2022: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

Writ of Possession

12/21/2021: Writ of Possession

Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

12/20/2021: Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

12/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

12/17/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Tarra Tarbush

12/17/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Tarra Tarbush

Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Tarra Tarbush and Occupants

12/17/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Tarra Tarbush and Occupants

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Charles A. Higgs III

12/17/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Charles A. Higgs III

Returned Mail

11/16/2021: Returned Mail

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Secretary of Veterans Affairs, an Officer of the United States of America; Tarbush, Tarra; Unlawful Detainer; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: Tarbush, Tarra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Tarra Tarbush; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Tarra Tarbush

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered; Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Tarra Tarbush and Occupants; Comment: Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Tarra Tarbush and Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Charles A. Higgs III; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Charles A. Higgs III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Notice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Served: 11/30/2021; Served: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2); Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order re Issuance of Summons on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer COVID-19 Rental Housing Recovery Act; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Order re Issuance of Summons on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer COVID-19 Rental Housing Recovery Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Foreclosure 1161a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMemo To Set, Dismissal or Settlement Due - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE SECRETARY OF VETERANS AFFAIRS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.