This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:02:04 (UTC).

Schwartz, Tanna vs Schwartz, Jolene

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Schwartz, Tanna filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Schwartz, Jolene. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McLean, Sandra L and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0707

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

Judge Details

Judges

McLean, Sandra L

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Schwartz, Tanna

Respondent

Schwartz, Jolene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rooney, Michael Martin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Expires 06/07/2025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order - Temporary Orders Granted Filed 5/20/2022; Petitioner: Schwartz, Tanna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Petitioner's Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Temporary Orders Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rooney, Michael Martin