This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/30/2022 at 17:42:21 (UTC).

Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento, a Corporation Sole vs Mullinax, Michelle

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento, a Corporation Sole filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mullinax, Michelle. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3681

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento, a Corporation Sole

Defendant

Mullinax, Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Weyuker, Richard Arthur

Sanden, Jennifer Hoke

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/11/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

12/11/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

12/11/2019: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Complaint

12/11/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

12/11/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

12/11/2019: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

3-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access

03/20/2020: 3-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access

Notice of Rescheduling

03/27/2020: Notice of Rescheduling

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

04/17/2020: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

05/08/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Summons Issued and Filed; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Notice of Rescheduling; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Automobile Injury; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $370.0; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5110.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weyuker, Richard A.