This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/09/2023 at 11:00:28 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Jenifer M vs McCay, Cameron M

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Rodriguez, Jenifer M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against McCay, Cameron M. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2877

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Jenifer M

Defendant

McCay, Cameron M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greenblatt, Hank Gregory

Defendant Attorney

Luetto, Helen Marie

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

10/06/2022: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Request for Dismissal-Unconditional Settlement

10/03/2022: Request for Dismissal-Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Settlement Unconditional

09/22/2022: Notice of Settlement Unconditional

Civil Minutes

05/18/2022: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement - Late Filed

05/04/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement - Late Filed

Defendant's Case Management Statement

05/03/2022: Defendant's Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

04/08/2022: Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

Association of Attorney as to Defendant

03/09/2022: Association of Attorney as to Defendant

Demand for Jury Trial

01/24/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer to Complaint

01/24/2022: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service Summons as to Cameron M McCay

12/23/2021: Proof of Service Summons as to Cameron M McCay

Proof of Mailing

11/23/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/23/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/23/2021: Complaint

Summons

11/23/2021: Summons

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2023

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 4 Day Estimate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 4 Day Estimate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketSettlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketStatus Conference; Civil Minutes; Notice of Settlement Unconditional; Request for Dismissal-Unconditional Settlement; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Notice of Settlement filed on 09/22/2022; Dismissal to be Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Request for Dismissal-Unconditional Settlement; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Unconditional

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Settlement; Notice of Settlement Unconditional; Comment: Notice of Settlement Unconditional

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference; Summons; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service Summons as to Cameron M McCay; Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Association of Attorney as to Defendant; Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant; Defendant's Case Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement - Late Filed; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Attorney: Greenblatt, Hank Gregory; Defendant; Associated Counsel: Luetto, Helen Marie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022

DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
01/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service Summons as to Cameron M McCay; Comment: Proof of Service Summons as to Cameron M McCay

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Judicial Review; Type: Action; Description: Personal Injury; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021

DocketCause Of Action; Action Judicial Review; File Date 11/23/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021

DocketProof of Service; Served: 12/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less