This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 00:17:30 (UTC).

Ray Morgan Company, LLC vs Alamo Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Ray Morgan Company, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alamo Group, LLC. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1992

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ray Morgan Company, LLC

Defendant

Alamo Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffith, David Richard

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/07/2020: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

10/07/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/07/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

10/07/2020: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alamo Group, LLC

10/20/2020: Proof of Service of Summons as to Alamo Group, LLC

Request to Enter Default-Entered

12/08/2020: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Civil Minutes

01/27/2021: Civil Minutes

Notice of Hearing

01/28/2021: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge to Judge Benson

01/29/2021: Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge to Judge Benson

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

02/05/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

Request for Clerk s Judgment

02/05/2021: Request for Clerk s Judgment

Declaration of Griffith in Support of Request for Clerk's Judgment

02/05/2021: Declaration of Griffith in Support of Request for Clerk's Judgment

Default Judgment by Clerk

02/05/2021: Default Judgment by Clerk

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Continued for Status of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type; Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names: Ray Morgan Company, LLC; Alamo Group, LLC; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: Ray Morgan Company, LLC; Judgment Amount: $23,199.67; Awarded Against: Alamo Group, LLC; Amount; Damages: $20,516.43; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 8.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,470.44; Attorney Fees: $663.00; Costs: $549.80; Total: $23199.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Griffith in Support of Request for Clerk's Judgment; Comment: Declaration of Griffith in Support of Request for Clerk's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Request for Clerk s Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment; Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge to Judge Benson; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Summons Issued and Filed; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons as to Alamo Group, LLC; Request to Enter Default-Entered; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Alamo Group, LLC; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Alamo Group, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Common Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Contract; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $21082.47; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $370.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adamo Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAY MORGAN COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griffith, David Richard