This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 16:41:43 (UTC).

Rambach, Dawn vs Rambach, Arron

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Rambach, Dawn filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Rambach, Arron. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McLean, Sandra L and Keithley, Clare. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1294

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

Judge Details

Judges

Keithley, Clare

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rambach, Dawn

Respondent

Rambach, Arron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

McNally, Miriam Elizabeth

Respondent Attorney

Henderson, Kimberly Ann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Request filed 9/20/21, Temporary Orders Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Respondent's Request for Order to Change the Restraining Order filed 07/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Fee; Comment: Proposed Stipulation and Order to Modify Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketRFO-OSC-MTN - DV (No Fee); Comment: Request for Order to Change the Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing DV116; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCourt Trial Setting/Resetting; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Request filed 9/20/2021, Temporary Orders Granted - Set from 10/06/2021 on Respondent's Objection; Petitioner; Attorney: McNally, Miriam Elizabeth; Respondent; Retained Counsel: Henderson, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing DV116; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:35 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Request filed 9/20/2021, Temporary Orders Granted; Petitioner; Attorney: McNally, Miriam Elizabeth; Respondent; Retained Counsel: Henderson, Kimberly Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRuling on Disqualification - Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Disqualification-Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNally, Miriam Elizabeth