This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 11:13:59 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Esqueda, Vivian

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Esqueda, Vivian. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Roberts, Barbara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2407

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Roberts, Barbara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Esqueda, Vivian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pierce, Emily Dehaas

 

Court Documents

Declaration Re: CCP 1033

04/25/2019: Declaration Re: CCP 1033

Statement of Venue

07/25/2018: Statement of Venue

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vivian Esqueda

09/25/2018: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vivian Esqueda

Request to Enter Default-Entered

04/25/2019: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Summons

07/25/2018: Summons

Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry Judgment

04/25/2019: Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry Judgment

Complaint

07/25/2018: Complaint

Default Judgment by Court

04/25/2019: Default Judgment by Court

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

07/25/2018: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry Judgment

04/25/2019: Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry Judgment

Declaration Re: CCP 1033

04/25/2019: Declaration Re: CCP 1033

Default Judgment by Court

04/25/2019: Default Judgment by Court

Request to Enter Default-Entered

04/25/2019: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

04/25/2019: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vivian Esqueda

09/25/2018: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vivian Esqueda

Statement of Venue

07/25/2018: Statement of Venue

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

07/25/2018: Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/25/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Roberts, Barbara L; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Esqueda, Vivian; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Awarded Against; Esqueda, Vivian; Judgment Amount: $2,786.20; Amount; Damages: $2,545.20; Costs: $241.00; Total: $2786.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry Judgment; Comment: Declaration of Custodian of Records in Support of Application for Entry Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re: CCP 1033; Comment: Declaration CCP 1033

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Roberts, Barbara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Comment: Entered as to Does Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vivian Esqueda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: First: Account Stated; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $2545.2; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 07/25/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 09/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement; Statement of Venue; Comment: of Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees; Comment: Re: Reduced Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce