This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 14:33:44 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Assoc vs Gebhart, Dave

Case Summary

On 03/25/2014 Portfolio Recovery Assoc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gebhart, Dave. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **1812

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Assoc

Defendant

Gebhart, Dave

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed

03/25/2014: Summons Issued / Filed

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

09/07/2018: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Request to Enter Default-Entered

06/09/2014: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; and Attorney Fees

06/09/2014: Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; and Attorney Fees

Complaint

03/25/2014: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/25/2014: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

10/31/2018: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County

09/07/2018: Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County

Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

06/12/2019: Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

Satisfaction of Judgment

07/03/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

06/12/2019: Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

02/20/2019: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs

02/20/2019: Memorandum of Costs

Notice of Returned Documents

01/18/2019: Notice of Returned Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

10/31/2018: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County

09/07/2018: Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

09/07/2018: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

06/18/2014: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment; Memorandum of Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Returned Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Writ of Execution Issued to Butte County; Comment: to Butte County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; and Attorney Fees; Comment: Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest; Costs CCP 1033; and Attorney Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketPersonal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketLegacy Service Information; Comment: Name: GEBHART, DAVE PartyId: 161812_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2014-04-14 00:00:00.0000000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant