This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 22:00:55 (UTC).

Pickler, Tiffany vs Darrow, Kyle

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Pickler, Tiffany filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Darrow, Kyle. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, McLean, Sandra L and Chandler, Christopher R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1046

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

McLean, Sandra L

Chandler, Christopher R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pickler, Tiffany

Respondent

Darrow, Kyle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Comment: Amended Restraining Order After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 7/21/2022 Temporary Orders Partly Granted - Continued from 8/10/2022 for Receipt of the Mediation Report; Petitioner: Pickler, Tiffany

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Proof of Mailing; Mediation Nonappearance Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Mediation No Show Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Expires 8/10/2025

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketReferral to Family Court Services Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order Filed 7/21/2022 Temporary Orders Partly Granted; Petitioner: Pickler, Tiffany; Respondent: Darrow, Kyle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 08/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Comment: Temporary Orders Partly Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less