This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:14:51 (UTC).

Peterson, Jennifer vs. City of Chico

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Peterson, Jennifer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Chico. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peterson, Jennifer

Defendant

City of Chico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lenzi, Albert James, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

Medellin, Sharon Ponce de Leon

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/12/2022: Complaint

Summons

01/12/2022: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

01/13/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

01/13/2022: Proof of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

01/25/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Complaint

01/12/2022: Complaint

Summons

01/12/2022: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

01/13/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

01/13/2022: Proof of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

01/25/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Defendant City of Chico's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

02/16/2022: Defendant City of Chico's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - No Fee; Defendant City of Chico's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Comment: Defendant City of Chico's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Premises Liability; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 01/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Chico is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDELLIN SHARON PONCE DE LEON ESQ.