This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 07:21:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Department of Transportation vs Debonneville, Laura et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 People of the State of California, Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Debonneville, Laura. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1059

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California, Department of Transportation

Defendants

Debonneville, Laura

Oxley, Camille

Debonneville, Matthew

Debonneville, David E

Debonneville, David N

Debonneville, John D

Suarez, Danielle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trent, David Michael

Khoury, Zahra

Brown, Paul Ramon

Defendant Attorney

Johnson, Ronald Roy

 

Court Documents

Defendant's Case Management Statement

11/01/2022: Defendant's Case Management Statement

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

11/01/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Demand for Exchange of Information

10/27/2022: Demand for Exchange of Information

Civil Minutes

10/19/2022: Civil Minutes

First Amended Answer to Complaint in Eminent Domain

10/13/2022: First Amended Answer to Complaint in Eminent Domain

Proof of Service of Summons as to David E Debonneville

06/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to David E Debonneville

Proof of Service of Summons as to David N Debonneville

06/21/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to David N Debonneville

Amendment to Complaint to Correct Name of Defendant; and Order

06/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint to Correct Name of Defendant; and Order

Proof of Service of Summons as to Matthew Debonneville

06/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Matthew Debonneville

Proof of Service of Summons as to John Debonneville

06/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to John Debonneville

Notice of Deposit

06/09/2021: Notice of Deposit

Notice of Pendency of Action

05/21/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action

Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/27/2021: Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/27/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Declaration Re Heirs and Devisees

04/27/2021: Declaration Re Heirs and Devisees

Complaint

04/27/2021: Complaint

Summons

04/27/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Complaint; Proof of Service of Summons as to John Debonneville; Proof of Service of Summons as to Matthew Debonneville; Amendment to Complaint to Correct Name of Defendant; and Order; Proof of Service of Summons as to David N Debonneville; Proof of Service of Summons as to David E Debonneville; First Amended Answer to Complaint in Eminent Domain; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1 Hour Time Estimate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Civil Minutes; Demand for Exchange of Information; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Defendant's Case Management Statement; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Defendant's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther; Demand for Exchange of Information; Comment: Demand for Exchange of Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered; Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Laura Debonneville; Comment: Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Laura Debonneville

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: The parties are ordered to appear. The Court is in receipt of the Amended Answer filed by Defendant Camille Oxley on October 13, 2022. The Court declines to comment on the sufficiency of that pleading. At the hearing the parties shall be prepared to select a trial date whereupon the matter of ownership can be addressed further.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Deposit; Comment: Notice of Deposit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Pendency of Action; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 06/02/2021; Served: 06/23/2021; Served: 06/09/2021; Served: 06/11/2021; Served: 06/02/2021; Served: 06/11/2021; Served: 06/02/2021; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 06/03/2021; Served: 06/03/2021; Served: 06/15/2021; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Comment: Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Heirs and Devisees; Comment: Declaration Re Heirs and Devisees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnson, Ronald Roy