This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 18:01:55 (UTC).

Penick, Douglas vs Eagle Security et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Penick, Douglas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Eagle Security. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0602

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Penick, Douglas

Defendants, Not Yet Classified and Cross Defendants

Eagle Security

Ray, Nicholas

Anderson, Joshua

Bailey, Holly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greenblatt, Hank Gregory

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Cholakian, Kevin Kay

Finn, Brian J

Luetto, Helen Marie

 

Court Documents

Civil Minutes

12/28/2022: Civil Minutes

Holy Bailey and Joshua Anderson's Case Management Statement

12/16/2022: Holy Bailey and Joshua Anderson's Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Jayananda Newman

12/16/2022: Request for Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Jayananda Newman

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

12/14/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Defendants' Case Management Statement

12/14/2022: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Cross Defendants Vyanet Operating Group, Inc Dba Eagle Security Systems and Nicholas Ray Answer

11/22/2022: Cross Defendants Vyanet Operating Group, Inc Dba Eagle Security Systems and Nicholas Ray Answer

Summons on Cross-Complaint of Bailey and Andersen

10/19/2022: Summons on Cross-Complaint of Bailey and Andersen

Cross-Complaint of Bailey and Andersen Against Eagle Security, Ray and Newman

10/19/2022: Cross-Complaint of Bailey and Andersen Against Eagle Security, Ray and Newman

Cross-Defendants Bailey and Andersen's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Eagle Security and Ray

10/19/2022: Cross-Defendants Bailey and Andersen's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Eagle Security and Ray

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference; Cross Defendants Vyanet Operating Group, Inc Dba Eagle Security Systems and Nicholas Ray Answer; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Request for Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Jayananda Newman; Holy Bailey and Joshua Anderson's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Attorney: Greenblatt, Hank Gregory; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Cholakian, Kevin Kay; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Cholakian, Kevin Kay; Cross Defendant; Retained Counsel: Luetto, Helen Marie; Cross Defendant; Retained Counsel: Luetto, Helen Marie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement; Holy Bailey and Joshua Anderson's Case Management Statement; Comment: Holy Bailey and Joshua Anderson's Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Jayananda Newman; Comment: Request for Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant Jayananda Newman

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer - No Fee; Cross Defendants Vyanet Operating Group, Inc Dba Eagle Security Systems and Nicholas Ray Answer; Comment: Cross Defendants Vyanet Operating Group, Inc Dba Eagle Security Systems and Nicholas Ray Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons on Cross-Complaint of Bailey and Andersen; Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint of Bailey and Andersen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
03/28/2022

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Personal Injury : May 31, 2020 Motor Vehicle Collision; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 03/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 03/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 03/28/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 06/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less