This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 05:20:58 (UTC).

Paradise Medical Group, Inc. vs TP-ACO, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Paradise Medical Group, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TP-ACO, LLC. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0267

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paradise Medical Group, Inc.

Defendant

TP-ACO, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shih, Candice P.

Cu, John T

Defendant Attorneys

Prendergast, Josiah Mark

Smith, Melville Zachary

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

09/30/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Hearing

09/10/2021: Notice of Hearing

Civil Minutes

09/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Returned Mail

09/21/2021: Returned Mail

Proof of Mailing

09/21/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Sanctions Imposed

09/10/2021: Notice of Sanctions Imposed

Removal to Federal Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

03/02/2021: Removal to Federal Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

Proof of Service of Summons as to TP-ACO, LLC

02/24/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to TP-ACO, LLC

Notice of Hearing

09/08/2021: Notice of Hearing

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

09/30/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Returned Mail

09/21/2021: Returned Mail

Proof of Mailing

09/21/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Sanctions Imposed

09/10/2021: Notice of Sanctions Imposed

Notice of Hearing

09/10/2021: Notice of Hearing

Civil Minutes

09/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Returned Mail Notice of Hearing

03/12/2021: Returned Mail Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

03/03/2021: Notice of Hearing

Removal to Federal Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

03/02/2021: Removal to Federal Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Status Re Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketConditional Settlement Stay Lifted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Notice of Sanctions Imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSanctions; Notice of Sanctions Imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSanctions; Notice of Sanctions Imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Status of Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paradise Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRENDERGAST JOSIAH M