This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/18/2022 at 16:09:06 (UTC).

Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC vs HOLCOMB, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOLCOMB, ROBERT. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gunn, David E, Worley, Kurt W and Goldkind, Leonard D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2079

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gunn, David E

Worley, Kurt W

Goldkind, Leonard D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC

Defendant

HOLCOMB, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tran, Marie C

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing

09/28/2016: Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing

Order

09/28/2016: Order

Request to Enter Default-Entered

10/25/2016: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Proof of Service

10/25/2016: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10/25/2016: Proof of Service

Default Judgment By Clerk

10/25/2016: Default Judgment By Clerk

Writ of Execution Issued

10/25/2016: Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

11/14/2016: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing

09/28/2016: Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing

Order

09/28/2016: Order

Request to Enter Default-Entered

10/25/2016: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Proof of Service

10/25/2016: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10/25/2016: Proof of Service

Default Judgment By Clerk

10/25/2016: Default Judgment By Clerk

Writ of Execution Issued

10/25/2016: Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

11/14/2016: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Goldkind, Leonard D; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Unlawful Detainer; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: HOLCOMB, ROBERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E; Comment: to Post

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application without Hearing; Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing; Comment: Declaration and Request to Post

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 10/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: 5 day summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketMemo To Set, Dismissal or Settlement Due - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less