This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 13:40:31 (UTC).

Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC vs Hamman, David Lee

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Hamman, David Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0500

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC

Defendant

Hamman, David Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tran, Marie C

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

06/01/2022: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

Writ of Possession Issued

05/18/2022: Writ of Possession Issued

Proof of Mailing

05/17/2022: Proof of Mailing

Judgment by Court After Court Trial

05/17/2022: Judgment by Court After Court Trial

Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem

05/13/2022: Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem

Civil Minutes

05/13/2022: Civil Minutes

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to David Lee Hamman

04/29/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to David Lee Hamman

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

04/29/2022: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

Request to Set Case for Trial

04/29/2022: Request to Set Case for Trial

Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Occupants

04/29/2022: Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Occupants

Proof of Service

03/23/2022: Proof of Service

Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

03/23/2022: Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

03/23/2022: Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

Proof of Mailing

03/11/2022: Proof of Mailing

Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

03/10/2022: Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

Summons Issued and Filed

03/09/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/09/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Forcible Detainer

03/09/2022: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Forcible Detainer

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Writ of Possession Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Judgment Type: Judgment After Trial By Court; Party; Names; Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC; Hamman, David Lee; Unlawful Detainer; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: Hamman, David Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Judgment by Court After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Forcible Detainer; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons Issued and Filed; Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2); Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service; Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Occupants; Request to Set Case for Trial; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to David Lee Hamman; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Occupants; Notice of Court Trial; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 15 Minute Estimate; Plaintiff: Oroville Mobile Home Park, LLC; Defendant: Hamman, David Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Occupants; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2); Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 03/19/2022; Served: 03/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint Filed; Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Forcible Detainer; Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed - Forcible Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMemo To Set, Dismissal or Settlement Due - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less