This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 00:49:43 (UTC).

Oliver, Daniel et al vs AAA Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Oliver, Daniel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AAA Insurance. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2741

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Oliver, Daniel

Oliver, Karen

Defendants

AAA INSURANCE

CSAA Insurance Services Inc.., A California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

West, Joseph Anthony

 

Court Documents

Summons

11/05/2021: Summons

Complaint

11/05/2021: Complaint

Proof of Mailing

11/08/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/08/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons

11/05/2021: Summons

Complaint

11/05/2021: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/08/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

11/08/2021: Proof of Mailing

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/03/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

04/08/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

04/27/2022: Civil Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Summons; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Attorney: West, Joseph Anthony; Plaintiff; Attorney: West, Joseph Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA Insurance Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEST JOSEPH A. ESQ.