This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:02:36 (UTC).

Norton, Frank vs Waterman, Dalton Daniel et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Norton, Frank filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Waterman, Dalton Daniel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0535

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norton, Frank

Defendants

Waterman, Dalton Daniel

R Christopher Crawford Construction, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lamb, Jeffrey Robbin

Kim, Ashley Euna

McNicholas, John Patrick, IV

Becker, Todd Benjamin

 

Court Documents

Summons

03/16/2022: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

03/16/2022: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/16/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

03/16/2022: Proof of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to R Christopher Crawford Construction, Inc

04/13/2022: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to R Christopher Crawford Construction, Inc

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Dalton Daniel Waterman

04/13/2022: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Dalton Daniel Waterman

Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance

05/19/2022: Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial

05/19/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Complaint; Proof of Mailing; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to R Christopher Crawford Construction, Inc; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Dalton Daniel Waterman; Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance; Demand for Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Dalton Daniel Waterman; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Dalton Daniel Waterman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to R Christopher Crawford Construction, Inc; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to R Christopher Crawford Construction, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Negligence; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 03/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 03/26/2022; Served: 03/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMB JEFFREY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER TODD BENJAMIN