This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 05:04:41 (UTC).

Neste, Cathy vs US Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Neste, Cathy filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against US Bank National Association. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2790

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neste, Cathy

Defendants

US Bank National Association

US Bancorp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Friedman, Todd Michael

George, Meghan Elisabeth

Defendant Attorneys

Fife, Joan B Tucker

Woodhead, Emilie Consuelo

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/28/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

11/28/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/29/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Defendants US Bank National Association and US Bancorp's Notice to Clerk of the Superior Court, All

12/29/2022: Defendants US Bank National Association and US Bancorp's Notice to Clerk of the Superior Court, All

Notice of Hearing

01/24/2023: Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Defendants US Bank National Association and US Bancorp's Notice to Clerk of the Superior Court, All; Notice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Status of Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemoval to Federal Court; Defendants US Bank National Association and US Bancorp's Notice to Clerk of the Superior Court, All

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Judicial Review; Type: Action; Description: Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Violation of the California Family Rights Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Violation of Labor COde 232.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Violation of Labor Code 1102.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Judicial Review; File Date 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Age Harassment, Discrimination and Retaliation in Employment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bancorp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODHEAD EMILIE CONSUELO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER-FIFE, JOAN B.