This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 21:00:13 (UTC).

Murphy, Wayne A vs Harper Ferguson, Catherine Renee et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Murphy, Wayne A filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Harper Ferguson, Catherine Renee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1362

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Murphy, Wayne A

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Harper Ferguson, Catherine Renee

George Rothert & Associates, INC, a California corporation

Nautilus Insurance Company, a corporation

EFI Global, a corporation

GEORGE ROTHERT & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Anderson, Robert H

George Rothert & Associates, Inc

Nautilus Insurance Group, LLC

Not Yet Classified

Catherine Renee Harper Ferguson, Trustee of the Catherine Rene Harper Ferguson Living Trust

Catherine Renee Harper Ferguson, Trustee of the Catherine Rene Harper Ferguson L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schaffer, Dylan Leon

Kerley, John Edward

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Murray, Todd Albert

Layne, Kendall Alexander

Graft, Alexander A

Berube, Bevin Ann

Moore, Marium Umeki

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Berube, Bevin Ann

Moore, Marium Umeki

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs-Summary

04/12/2022: Memorandum of Costs-Summary

Proof of Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Service

Civil Minutes

10/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date re Special Motion to Strike Complaint

09/28/2021: Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date re Special Motion to Strike Complaint

Civil Minutes

02/09/2022: Civil Minutes

Defendant's Case Management Statement

01/28/2022: Defendant's Case Management Statement

George Rothert & Associates' Case Management Statement

01/25/2022: George Rothert & Associates' Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Order

01/25/2022: Notice of Entry of Order

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

01/25/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Judgment

06/09/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Mailing

06/09/2022: Proof of Mailing

Amended Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of George Rothert & Associates

05/19/2022: Amended Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of George Rothert & Associates

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

05/11/2022: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

05/11/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Civil Minutes

05/11/2022: Civil Minutes

Defendant Catherine Renee Harper Ferguson's Case Management Statement

04/28/2022: Defendant Catherine Renee Harper Ferguson's Case Management Statement

Plaintiff Wayne A Murphy's Case Management Statement

04/26/2022: Plaintiff Wayne A Murphy's Case Management Statement

Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company's Case Management Statement

04/26/2022: Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company's Case Management Statement

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Further Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling; Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment; Amended Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of George Rothert & Associates; Comment: Amended Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of George Rothert & Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Defendant George Rothert and Associates, Inc's Case Management Statement; Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company's Case Management Statement; Plaintiff Wayne A Murphy's Case Management Statement; Defendant Catherine Renee Harper Ferguson's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Further Status; Plaintiff; Attorney: Kerley, John Edward; Defendant; Attorney: Murray, Todd Albert; Defendant; Attorney: Berube, Bevin Ann; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Graft, Alexander A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Defendant Catherine Renee Harper Ferguson's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff Wayne A Murphy's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/28/2021; Served: 07/16/2021; Served: 07/19/2021; Served: 07/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EFI Global, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Murray, Todd A