This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 11:55:46 (UTC).

Mountain View MHC, LLC vs Partyka, Maria et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 Mountain View MHC, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Partyka, Maria. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1998

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mountain View MHC, LLC

Defendants

Partyka, Maria

Burns, Eddie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rubino, Michael Joseph

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

11/17/2022: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

Writ of Possession

11/03/2022: Writ of Possession

Judgment by Court

10/28/2022: Judgment by Court

Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem

10/28/2022: Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem

Civil Minutes

10/28/2022: Civil Minutes

Proof of Service of Summons as to Eddie Burns

10/17/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Eddie Burns

Request to Set Case for Trial

10/17/2022: Request to Set Case for Trial

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as Does 1 to 10

10/17/2022: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as Does 1 to 10

Request to Enter Default-Entered as to All Other Occupants

10/17/2022: Request to Enter Default-Entered as to All Other Occupants

Proof of Service

09/22/2022: Proof of Service

Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

09/20/2022: Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

09/20/2022: Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

Notice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2)

09/01/2022: Notice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2)

Verification by Landlord

08/31/2022: Verification by Landlord

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

08/31/2022: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

08/31/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

08/31/2022: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Judgment Type: Judgment After Trial By Court; Party; Names; Mountain View MHC, LLC; Partyka, Maria; Burns, Eddie; Unlawful Detainer; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: Partyka, Maria; Awarded Against: Burns, Eddie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed; Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000; Proof of Service; Request to Enter Default-Entered as to All Other Occupants; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as Does 1 to 10; Request to Set Case for Trial; Proof of Service of Summons as to Eddie Burns; Proof of Service of Summons as to All Other Occupants; Proof of Service of Summons as to Maria Partyka; Notice of Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Trial Commenced; Comment: 15 Minute Time Estimate; Plaintiff: Mountain View MHC, LLC; Retained Counsel: Rubino, Michael Joseph

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Trial; Notice of Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Maria Partyka; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Maria Partyka

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to All Other Occupants; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to All Other Occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 09/14/2022; Served: 09/13/2022; Served: 09/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification by Plaintiff Re: Rental Assistance - COV19 RRD; Verification by Landlord

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMemo To Set, Dismissal or Settlement Due - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less