This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 03:03:18 (UTC).

Mountain View MHC, LLC vs Berry, Adam et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Mountain View MHC, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Berry, Adam. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1325

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mountain View MHC, LLC

Respondents

Berry, Adam

Duncan, Nicholas Jordan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rubino, Michael Joseph

 

Court Documents

Petition for Judgment to Declare Abandonment of Mobilehome

06/22/2022: Petition for Judgment to Declare Abandonment of Mobilehome

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Petition for Judgment of Abandonment

06/22/2022: Notice of Petition for Judgment of Abandonment

Request to Enter Default-Entered

07/27/2022: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1 to 10 Inclusive

07/27/2022: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1 to 10 Inclusive

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony

07/27/2022: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony

Proofs of Service

07/27/2022: Proofs of Service

Judgment of Abandonment Damages and Costs

08/01/2022: Judgment of Abandonment Damages and Costs

Proof of Mailing

08/19/2022: Proof of Mailing

Inventory Report of Contents in Abandoned Mobilehome

08/24/2022: Inventory Report of Contents in Abandoned Mobilehome

Accounting Report Following Sale of Abandoned Mobilehome and Its Contents

09/26/2022: Accounting Report Following Sale of Abandoned Mobilehome and Its Contents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport; Accounting Report Following Sale of Abandoned Mobilehome and Its Contents; Comment: Accounting Report Following Sale of Abandoned Mobilehome and Its Contents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport; Inventory Report of Contents in Abandoned Mobilehome; Comment: Inventory Report of Contents in Abandoned Mobilehome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Mountain View MHC, LLC; Berry, Adam; Duncan, Nicholas Jordan; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Mountain View MHC, LLC; Awarded Against; Berry, Adam; Duncan, Nicholas Jordan; Amount; Damages: $7,108.20; Costs: $225.00; Total: $7333.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Judgment of Abandonment Damages and Costs; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Proofs of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Lieu of Testimony; Comment: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1 to 10 Inclusive; Comment: as to Does 1 to 10 Inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Petition for Judgment of Abandonment; Comment: Notice of Petition for Judgment of Abandonment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - No Fee; Petition for Judgment to Declare Abandonment of Mobilehome; Comment: Petition for Judgment to Declare Abandonment of Mobilehome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less