This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 10:49:37 (UTC).

Mountain View MHC, LLC vs Berry, Adam

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Mountain View MHC, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Berry, Adam. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0261

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mountain View MHC, LLC

Defendant

Berry, Adam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tran, Marie C

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

02/08/2022: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/08/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

02/08/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Verification by Landlord

02/08/2022: Verification by Landlord

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

02/08/2022: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

02/08/2022: Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

Order re Issuance of Summons on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer COVID-19 Rental Housing Recovery Act

02/08/2022: Order re Issuance of Summons on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer COVID-19 Rental Housing Recovery Act

Proof of Mailing

02/10/2022: Proof of Mailing

Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

03/14/2022: Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

03/14/2022: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

Request to Enter Default-Entered

03/14/2022: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Writ of Possession

03/14/2022: Writ of Possession

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

03/14/2022: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Adam Berry

03/14/2022: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Adam Berry

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

03/30/2022: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Mountain View MHC, LLC; Berry, Adam; Unlawful Detainer; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: Berry, Adam

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Adam Berry; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Adam Berry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 02/18/2022; Served: 02/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order re Issuance of Summons on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer COVID-19 Rental Housing Recovery Act; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Order re Issuance of Summons on Complaint for Unlawful Detainer COVID-19 Rental Housing Recovery Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2); Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP 1161.2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther; Verification by Landlord; Comment: Verification by Landlord

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMemo To Set, Dismissal or Settlement Due - Unlawful Detainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less