This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 01:03:42 (UTC).

Mimms, Tiffany et al vs Martinez, Irene et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Mimms, Tiffany filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Martinez, Irene. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2887

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mimms, Tiffany

Lomas, Anthony

Defendants

Martinez, Irene

Guadianasr, Santiago

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buckley, Larry Spencer

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

11/24/2021: Summons

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/24/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

11/24/2021: Proof of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez

02/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez

Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr

02/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

11/24/2021: Summons

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/24/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

11/24/2021: Proof of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez

02/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez

Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr

02/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

05/02/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

05/18/2022: Civil Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez; Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Retained Counsel: Buckley, Larry Spencer; Plaintiff; Retained Counsel: Buckley, Larry Spencer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Guadianasr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Irene Martinez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: General Negligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Motor Vehicle; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 01/27/2022; Served: 01/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCKLEY, LARRY S.