This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 09:07:12 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Pyer, Scott

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pyer, Scott. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3704

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Pyer, Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siduguen, Christine Sufen-Chang

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Scott Pyer

12/05/2018: Plaintiff's Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Scott Pyer

Writ of Execution Issued

10/27/2020: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

10/27/2020: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

03/23/2020: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Plaintiff's Declaration of Venue

11/09/2018: Plaintiff's Declaration of Venue

Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee

11/09/2018: Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee

Request to Enter Default-Entered

03/15/2019: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys Fees

03/15/2019: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys Fees

Default Judgment By Court

03/19/2019: Default Judgment By Court

Writ of Execution Issued

03/07/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

03/07/2022: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Writ of Execution Issued

10/27/2020: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

10/27/2020: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

03/23/2020: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

09/20/2019: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

09/20/2019: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Default Judgment By Court

03/19/2019: Default Judgment By Court

Notice of Change of Address

03/15/2019: Notice of Change of Address

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Midland Funding LLC; Pyer, Scott; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Midland Funding LLC; Awarded Against; Pyer, Scott; Amount; Damages: $2,726.87; Costs: $276.00; Total: $3002.87

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChange of Address; Notice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Second Cause Open Book Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: First Cause Account Stated; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $2726.87

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 11/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 11/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 12/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee; Comment: Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Plaintiff's Declaration of Venue; Comment: Declaration of Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIDUGUEN, CHRISTINE SUFEN-CHANG