This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/09/2022 at 14:15:02 (UTC).

McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc vs Terrance J Foster Medical Corporation, a corporation

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Terrance J Foster Medical Corporation, a corporation. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1277

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc

Defendant

Terrance J Foster Medical Corporation, a corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Guerrini, John D

Gaba, Rodolfo, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

05/19/2022: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

05/09/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

11/02/2021: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

11/01/2021: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Default Judgment by Clerk

06/28/2021: Default Judgment by Clerk

Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr in Support of Clerk's Judgment

06/28/2021: Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr in Support of Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

06/17/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

05/09/2022: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChange of Address; Notice of Change of Address as to Plaintiff's Attorney; Comment: Notice of Change of Address as to Plaintiff's Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Writ of Execution Issued Sutter; Comment: Writ of Execution Issued Sutter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling; Notice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc; Terrance J Foster Medical Corporation, a corporation; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc; Awarded Against; Terrance J Foster Medical Corporation, a corporation; Judgment Amount: $7,556.02; Amount; Damages: $5,666.02; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $406.10; Attorney Fees: $1,149.90; Costs: $334.00; Total: $7556.02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr in Support of Clerk's Judgment; Comment: Declaration of Rodolfo Gaba Jr in Support of Clerk's Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1 - 100, Inclusive; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1 - 100, Inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Contract; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5666.02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 05/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUERRINI JOHN DONALD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO