This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 11:07:52 (UTC).

McCord, Jarred vs Roll, Penny Lynn

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 McCord, Jarred filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Roll, Penny Lynn. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Keithley, Clare and McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1069

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Keithley, Clare

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

McCord, Jarred

Respondent

Roll, Penny Lynn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Petitioner's Request for DV/TRO filed 7/26/2022 - Temporary Orders Granted, Continued from 09/06/2022 for Respondent to Obtain Counsel and for

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for DV/TRO filed 7/26/2022 - Temporary Orders Granted; Petitioner; Attorney: Diamond, Nicole M; Respondent: Roll, Penny Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of DV-120 as to Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketResponse to Request for Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for DV/TRO filed 7/26/2022 - Temporary Orders Granted; Petitioner: McCord, Jarred; Attorney: Diamond, Nicole M; Respondent: Roll, Penny Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order- No Minor Children (NF); Comment: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.