This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 19:00:12 (UTC).

Margaret L Cottingham Revocable Trust dated 2/1/2001

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Margaret L Cottingham Revocable Trust dated 2/1/2001 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0547

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Porter, Gregory K

Respondent

Cottingham, Margaret L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LeClerc, Raoul J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

10/17/2022: Notice of Hearing

Petition to Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee

10/17/2022: Petition to Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee

Capacity Declarations re Cottingham

11/08/2022: Capacity Declarations re Cottingham

Order for Removal of Trustee and Appointing Successor Trustee

11/29/2022: Order for Removal of Trustee and Appointing Successor Trustee

Proof of Mailing

11/29/2022: Proof of Mailing

Probate Minutes

11/29/2022: Probate Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: Absent objection the petition is granted and the Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order for Removal of Trustee and Appointing Successor Trustee; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Order for Removal of Trustee and Appointing Successor Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Petition to Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee; Capacity Declarations re Cottingham; Order for Removal of Trustee and Appointing Successor Trustee; Proof of Mailing; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee; Petitioner; Attorney: LeClerc, Raoul J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapacity Declaration-Conservatorship; Capacity Declarations re Cottingham; Comment: Capacity Declarations re Cottingham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code; Petition to Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee; Comment: Petition to Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less