This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/26/2022 at 03:10:35 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING vs RHOADES, CHAD

Case Summary

On 12/08/2015 LVNV FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RHOADES, CHAD. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **5425

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING

Defendant

RHOADES, CHAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colclough, Robert James, III

 

Court Documents

Declaration

07/25/2016: Declaration

Declaration

07/25/2016: Declaration

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

08/29/2018: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

07/06/2018: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Writ of Execution; Butte County

07/06/2018: Writ of Execution; Butte County

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

02/22/2017: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Request to Enter Default-Entered

07/25/2016: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Writ of Execution Issued

08/24/2016: Writ of Execution Issued

Default Judgment By Clerk

07/29/2016: Default Judgment By Clerk

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

08/29/2018: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution; Butte County

07/06/2018: Writ of Execution; Butte County

Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

07/06/2018: Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment

Plaintiff's Substitution of Attorney

07/06/2018: Plaintiff's Substitution of Attorney

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

02/22/2017: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

08/24/2016: Writ of Execution Issued

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

08/15/2016: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

Default Judgment By Clerk

07/29/2016: Default Judgment By Clerk

Declaration

07/25/2016: Declaration

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Writ of Execution; Butte County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs-After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Plaintiff's Substitution of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Comment: Butte County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; LVNV FUNDING; RHOADES, CHAD; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; LVNV FUNDING; Awarded Against; RHOADES, CHAD; Judgment Amount: $1,335.08; Amount; Damages: $1,051.08; Costs: $284.00; Total: $1335.08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Default Judgment By Clerk; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: re CC 1788.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Interest; CCP 1033; Attorney Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered; Comment: Chad Rhoades

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC AS TO CHAD RHOADES Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketPersonal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketLegacy Service Information; Comment: Name: RHOADES, CHAD PartyId: 165425_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2016-01-12 00:00:00.0000000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED - 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED (UNDER 10K) CK#581300 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 750009 Fee Amount: 225.00 Entry Clerk: MMC 538 - $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES