This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 06:01:49 (UTC).

Loriano, Laura J vs. City of Chico

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Loriano, Laura J filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against City of Chico. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2290

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loriano, Laura J

Defendant

City of Chico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stralen, John Thomas

Minney, Andrew G

Arnold, Clayeo Clyde

Defendant Attorney

Colvin, Roger A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/10/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

09/10/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

09/14/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

10/07/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to City of Chico

10/18/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to City of Chico

City of Chico's Answer

11/08/2021: City of Chico's Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons Issued and Filed; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to City of Chico; City of Chico's Answer; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; City of Chico's Answer; Comment: City of Chico's Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to City of Chico; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to City of Chico

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: Dangerous Condition of Public Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: Premises Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Chico is a litigant