This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/26/2022 at 04:02:33 (UTC).

LONG, ELIZABETH VS IMBACH, RYAN

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 LONG, ELIZABETH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IMBACH, RYAN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McLean, Sandra L, Mosbarger, Tamara L, Candela, Michael P and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **4598

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

McLean, Sandra L

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LONG, ELIZABETH

LONG, NATHANAEL, Jr.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

IMBACH, RYAN

BUTTE WATER DISTRICT

SCHOHR, TRACY

Defendant and Not Yet Classified

BUTTE WATER DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stralen, John Thomas

Arnold, Clayeo C

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Zimmerman, Robert Harry

Wallis, David A

LAMORE, BRAZIER & ONEAL

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

LAMORE, BRAZIER & ONEAL

 

Court Documents

Trial Readiness Conference Statement

06/08/2017: Trial Readiness Conference Statement

Motion in Limine

06/08/2017: Motion in Limine

Trial Readiness Conference Statement

06/08/2017: Trial Readiness Conference Statement

Reply

04/07/2017: Reply

Case Management Statement

05/18/2016: Case Management Statement

Motion - Summary Judgment

03/29/2016: Motion - Summary Judgment

Evidence in Support

01/24/2017: Evidence in Support

Declaration

03/30/2017: Declaration

Ex Parte Application with Hearing

04/25/2017: Ex Parte Application with Hearing

Plaintiff's Satisfaction of Judgment

06/26/2018: Plaintiff's Satisfaction of Judgment

Defendants' Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs

03/29/2018: Defendants' Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs

Proof of Mailing of Minute Order dated 2/2/18

02/02/2018: Proof of Mailing of Minute Order dated 2/2/18

Civil Minutes

02/02/2018: Civil Minutes

Reply

01/26/2018: Reply

Plaintiffs' Oppositon To Defendants' Motion To Tax Costs

01/22/2018: Plaintiffs' Oppositon To Defendants' Motion To Tax Costs

Notice of Reassignment

01/03/2018: Notice of Reassignment

Defendants' (Imbach/Schohr) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Tax Costs

12/28/2017: Defendants' (Imbach/Schohr) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Tax Costs

Ryan Imbach's Notice of Motion and Motion to Tax Costs

12/28/2017: Ryan Imbach's Notice of Motion and Motion to Tax Costs

251 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Plaintiff's Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNotice; Comment: Of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Defendants' Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Comment: Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing of Minute Order dated 2/2/18; Comment: Minute Order dated 2/2/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: The Court grants Defendant's Motion to Tax Costs to the extent that the Plaintiffs agree that $6,208.08 should not be included on the Memorandum of Costs, leaving $20,571.72 in costs. The remainder of Defendant's motion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Hearings - Postdisposition; Ryan Imbach's Notice of Motion and Motion to Tax Costs; Defendants' (Imbach/Schohr) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Tax Costs; Reply; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Comment: In Support of Dedendants' Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - No Fee; Plaintiffs' Oppositon To Defendants' Motion To Tax Costs; Comment: To Defendants' Motion To Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Reassignment; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable; Comment: NON-REFUNDABLE JURY DEPOSIT OF DEFS RYAN IMBACH & TRACY SCHOHR CK#91196108 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 740915 Fee Amount: 150.00 Entry Clerk: KLD 567 - $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Comment: ANSWER OF RYAN IMBACH & TRACY SCHOHR CK#91196108 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 2 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 740914 Fee Amount: 870.00 Entry Clerk: KLD 535 - $870.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable; Comment: NON-REFUNDABLE JURY DEPOSIT BY DEFT WATERMAN INDUSTRIES CK# D3429163 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 740387 Fee Amount: 150.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 567 - $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited Waterman Industires, LLC; Comment: ANSWER OF WATERMAN INDUSTRIES TO PLNTFF'S UNVERIFIED COMP; DEMAND FOR JT CK# D3429163 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 740385 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 535 - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint - No Fee; Comment: CROSS-COMPL FILED BY BUTTE WATER DISTRICT ** NO SUMMONS ISSUED ** Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited Butte Water District; Comment: ANSWER OF BUTTE WATER DISTRICT Fee Type: W4 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: KLD 535 - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Comment: NTC OF ASSIGNMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED (OVER 25K) CK#4159 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 733483 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: KLD 534 - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butte Water District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T Stralen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayeo C Arnold