This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 06:02:08 (UTC).

KBR Inc dba Rash Curtis & Associates vs Peterson Ditmanson, Cheryl F

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 KBR Inc dba Rash Curtis Associates filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Peterson Ditmanson, Cheryl F. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1429

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KBR Inc dba Rash Curtis & Associates

Defendant

Peterson Ditmanson, Cheryl F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliveira, Duane Steven

 

Court Documents

Request to Enter Default-Entered

07/16/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Proof of Service of Summons Filed

06/10/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

Complaint

06/03/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/03/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

06/03/2021: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Common Counts; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $1042.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KBR Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates is a litigant